|
26.04.2011 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
30.11.2010 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2010 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.08.2010 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2010 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2009 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.06.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
07.05.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
07.05.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.05.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.05.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.05.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2008 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2008 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.02.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.02.2008 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2008 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.02.2008 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
01.02.2008 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.12.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
27.12.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
21.12.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.09.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.05.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.01.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.01.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2003 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2003 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.02.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.11.2002 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.07.2002 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.07.2002 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.07.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.07.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.07.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
01.07.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
01.07.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
01.07.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
01.07.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.07.2002 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.06.2002 |
Annex |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
03.06.2002 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.06.2002 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.06.2002 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
03.06.2002 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
03.06.2002 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
30.05.2002 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2002 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.03.2002 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.03.2002 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
24.01.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.01.2002 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.07.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.07.2001 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.06.2001 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.06.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.06.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
23.04.2001 |
Urgent incoming letter |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
23.04.2001 |
Urgent incoming letter |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Urgent incoming letter |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.02.2001 |
Urgent incoming letter |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.08.2000 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.08.2000 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.08.2000 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
4 |