EP1208133 - COPOLYMERS FOR THE TRANSFER OF NUCLEIC ACIDS TO THE CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2006 [2006/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plank, Christian Ulrich-Haid-Strasse 1 82229 Seefeld / DE | For all designated states Finsinger, Dirk Pippingerstrasse 33 81245 München / DE | [2002/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2003/45] |
Former [2002/22] | Laudien, Dieter, Dr., et al c/o Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH 55216 Ingelheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 00947874.4 | 23.06.2000 | [2002/22] | WO2000EP05869 | Priority number, date | EP19990112260 | 25.06.1999 Original published format: EP 99112260 | [2002/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0100709 | Date: | 04.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1208133 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/329, C08G65/333, A61K48/00, C12N15/87, A61K47/48 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
C12N15/87 (EP);
A61K47/6935 (EP);
A61K48/00 (EP);
C08G65/329 (EP);
C08G65/333 (EP);
C08G65/33396 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | COPOLYMERE FÜR DEN TRANSPORT VON NUKLEINSÄUREN IN DIE ZELLE | [2002/22] | English: | COPOLYMERS FOR THE TRANSFER OF NUCLEIC ACIDS TO THE CELL | [2002/22] | French: | COPOLYMERES POUR LE TRANSPORT D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE DANS LES CELLULES | [2002/22] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 11.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/06] | 07.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9819710 (SCHACHT ETIENNE HONORE ;ULBRICH KAREL (CZ); SEYMOUR LEONARD CHARLE) [X] 1-9 * figure 4 * * claims 1,10,11 *; | [X]WO9621036 (VIAGENE INC) [X] 1-9 * claims 1,3,4 *; | [X]WO9725067 (DAVIS STANLEY STEWART ;UNIV NOTTINGHAM (GB); GARNETT MARTIN CHARLE) [X] 1-9 * claims 1,6-8 * * page 3, line 24 - line 25 *; | [X]JPH1028583 ; | [X]WO9409056 (STERLING WINTHROP INC) [X] 1-5 * claims 1,4,9 * * page 4, line 20 - line 21 * * page 9, line 10 - line 30 *; | [XD]US5455027 (ZALIPSKY SAMUEL ET AL) [XD] 1-5 * column 4, lines 15-20 * * column 27, line 16 *; | [PX]WO9959546 (EXPRESSION GENETICS INC) [PX] 1-9 * figure 1; claims 1-22 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 06, & JP10028583 A 19980203 (HISAMITSU PHARMACEUT CO INC) [X] 1-6,8,9 * abstract * |