|
04.03.2016 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
22.02.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Request for change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2013 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
02.11.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.11.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.10.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.10.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.07.2012 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.05.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
25 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.05.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
19 |
|
23.02.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2012 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.02.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.02.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.11.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2007 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.11.2007 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.09.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2007 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.01.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.01.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2007 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
23.01.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
23.01.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
23.01.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
23.01.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
23.01.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.01.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
23.01.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.01.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
23.01.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
19.01.2007 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
09.03.2006 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.12.2005 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2005 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.12.2005 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2005 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
25.10.2005 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2005 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.10.2005 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
12.08.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.08.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.08.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.08.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.08.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.08.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.08.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.08.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.08.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.08.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.04.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.09.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2002 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2002 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2002 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2002 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.07.2001 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.05.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.05.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.05.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
07.05.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
07.05.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
07.05.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
07.05.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.05.2001 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
27.02.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.02.2001 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.02.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
08.02.2001 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.02.2001 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
05.02.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
13.11.2000 |
Urgent incoming letter |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.11.2000 |
Notification relating to priority claim |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2000 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
22.08.2000 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
22.08.2000 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
43 |