|
26.09.2014 |
Registration under Rule 23 EPC |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2014 |
Deficiencies as to Rule 23 EPC |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2014 |
Rule 23 - Annex C |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2014 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.2014 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2013 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.12.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.08.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.08.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
27.07.2012 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.07.2012 |
Registration under Rule 23 EPC |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2012 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
06.07.2012 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2012 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
04.07.2012 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2012 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
13.03.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
23.01.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.01.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.01.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.01.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.12.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.12.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.12.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.12.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.12.2011 |
Description |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.12.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.10.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.2011 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
14 |
|
24.10.2011 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2010 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
09.11.2010 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2010 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2009 |
Registration under Rule 23 EPC |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
26.02.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
26.02.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.02.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.02.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
26.02.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
26.02.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
26.02.2009 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.02.2009 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.02.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
26.02.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Rule 23 - Annex A |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Rule 23 - Annex C |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
30.05.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.04.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2008 |
Decision to refuse according to the state of the file |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2008 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2008 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2007 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.10.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.04.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.10.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.03.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.03.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.03.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.03.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.03.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.01.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.09.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.06.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.06.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.06.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.06.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.06.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.03.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.10.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.03.2003 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2003 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.01.2003 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.12.2002 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
05.12.2002 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.10.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
14.10.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.10.2002 |
Refund of fees |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.10.2002 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.08.2002 |
Written opinion - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
21.05.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.02.2002 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.02.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.02.2002 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
15.02.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.02.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.02.2002 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
13.02.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
31.01.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2002 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
16.08.2000 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.08.2000 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
16.08.2000 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
16.08.2000 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
16.08.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |