|
26.02.2009 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.01.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
20 |
|
16.10.2008 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.09.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.2008 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.08.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.08.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.08.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
18.08.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
02.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2008 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
10 |
|
13.06.2008 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2008 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.08.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.08.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.05.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2006 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
20.04.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
20.04.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
88 |
|
20.04.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
88 |
|
18.04.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
18.04.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
18.04.2006 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.02.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2006 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2006 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
14 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
14 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
13 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
14 |
|
23.11.2005 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.09.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.09.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.09.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.02.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.12.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.10.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2004 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
27.02.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
27.02.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
27.02.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
48 |
|
27.02.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
26.02.2004 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
23.04.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2003 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2003 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.02.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.12.2002 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.12.2002 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2002 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.07.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.2002 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
30.01.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.03.2001 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.02.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.02.2001 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.02.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.02.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.02.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.02.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.02.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.02.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.02.2001 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.02.2001 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.01.2001 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
11.01.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
11.01.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
11.01.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
11.01.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
11.01.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
11.01.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
11.01.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
11.01.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
11.01.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
11.01.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
11.01.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
11.01.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
11.01.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
11.01.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
11.01.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
11.01.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
11.01.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
11.01.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
11.01.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
11.01.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
11.01.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
02.01.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.12.2000 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
23.12.2000 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.12.2000 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
21.12.2000 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
09.11.2000 |
Urgent incoming letter |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.10.2000 |
Urgent incoming letter |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.08.2000 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.08.2000 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
24.08.2000 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
18 |