EP1204706 - METHOD FOR PROTECTING METALS AGAINST CORROSION AND NON-POLLUTING REACTIVE COMPOSITION THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | 19.11.2004 | Change - applicant | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arkema 4-8 Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states ARKEMA 4-8 Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [2002/20] | For all designated states Atofina 4/8 Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POUYFAUCON, Jacques Pierre 18, rue de Porteteni 40480 Vieux-Boucau-les-Bains / FR | 02 /
BOUTEVIN, Bernard Jean Léon 1, rue A. Mathieu 34000 Montpelier / FR | 03 /
HERVAUD, Yves 174, avenue de Lodeve 34000 Montpelier / FR | [2002/20] | Representative(s) | Schwartz, Thierry J. Cabinet Orès 36, rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | Schwartz, Thierry J. Cabinet Orès, 36, rue de St Petersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/20] | Rataboul, Michel Charles CMR INTERNATIONAL, 10, rue de Florence 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00951583.4 | 13.06.2000 | [2002/20] | WO2000FR01636 | Priority number, date | FR19990007440 | 11.06.1999 Original published format: FR 9907440 | [2002/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0077101 | Date: | 21.12.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1204706 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/08 | [2002/20] | CPC: |
C09D5/08 (EP,KR,US);
B05D3/10 (KR);
B05D7/24 (KR);
C09D7/63 (KR);
C23C22/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2002/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM KORROSIONSSCHUTZ VON METALLEN UND NICHT-VERUNREININGENDE REAKTIVE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG DAZU | [2002/20] | English: | METHOD FOR PROTECTING METALS AGAINST CORROSION AND NON-POLLUTING REACTIVE COMPOSITION THEREFOR | [2002/20] | French: | PROCEDE DE PROTECTION DES METAUX CONTRE LA CORROSION ET COMPOSITION REACTIVE NON POLLUANTE POUR SA MISE EN OEUVRE | [2002/20] | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/20] | 25.02.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 01 | 20.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/01] | 05.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0516346 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1,4-6,8,12-15 * page 6, line 1 - page 8, line 50 * * page 9, line 31 - page 10, line 4 * * page 10, line 56 - page 11, line 16 *; | [A]EP0277711 (ICI PLC [GB]) [A] 1,2,4,5,8-14 * page 2, lines 28-39 * * page 4, lines 17-54 * * page 5, lines 3-5 * * page 5, lines 4-53 *; | [A]EP0763574 (DAINIPPON TORYO KK [JP]) [A] 4,5,8-15 * page 2, line 45 - page 3, line 21 * * page 3, line 55 - page 4, line 2 * * page 4, lines 5-9 * * page 4, lines 23-25 *; | [A]EP0035316 (ICI PLC [GB]) [A] 1-4 * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 14 * * page 5, line 26 - page 6, line 20 * * page 6, lines 23-27 *; | [A]WO9906450 (DU PONT [US], et al); | [DA]EP0704465 (COCKERILL RECH & DEV [BE]) |