EP1206685 - REFLECTION MATERIAL MEASURE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A REFLECTION MATERIAL MEASURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Postfach 12 60 83292 Traunreut / DE | [2002/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEIDMANN, Josef Kramerstrasse 10 D-83224 Grassau / DE | 02 /
SPECKBACHER, Peter Blumenstrasse 3a D-84558 Kirchweidach / DE | [2002/21] | Application number, filing date | 00953051.0 | 15.07.2000 | [2002/21] | WO2000EP06772 | Priority number, date | DE1999137023 | 05.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19937023 | [2002/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0111320 | Date: | 15.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1206685 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1206685 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/347, G02B5/00 | [2002/21] | CPC: |
G01D5/34707 (EP,US);
G01D5/347 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/20] |
Former [2003/22] | DE, FR, GB, NL | ||
Former [2002/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | REFLEXIONS-MASSVERKÖRPERUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER RELEXIONS-MASSVERKÖRPERUNG | [2002/21] | English: | REFLECTION MATERIAL MEASURE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A REFLECTION MATERIAL MEASURE | [2002/21] | French: | MESURE MATERIALISEE A REFLEXION ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE MESURE MATERIALISEE A REFLEXION | [2002/21] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/21] | 16.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB2072850 (MITUTOYO MFG CO LTD) [Y] 1,10 * page 1, line 57 - line 86 *; | [A]US4644156 (TAKAHASHI YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,10 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0511597 (MEGAMATION INC [US]) [A] 1,10 * column 3, line 33 - line 52 *; | [Y]DE4320728 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES [DE]) [Y] 1,10 * column 3, line 19 - line 27 *; | [A]EP0849567 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES [DE]) [A] 1,10 * column 4, line 33 - line 52 *; | [DA] - ZUBEL I, "Silicon anisotropic etching in alkaline solutions. II. On the influence of anisotropy on the smoothness of etched surfaces", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A,CH,ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, (19981030), vol. 70, no. 3, ISSN 0924-4247, pages 260 - 268, XP004140059 [DA] 1-5,7,9-18 * column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0924-4247(98)00142-3 | [A] - ZUBEL I ET AL, "Silicon anisotropic etching in alkaline solutions. I. The geometric description of figures developed under etching Si(100) in various solutions", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A,CH,ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, (19981030), vol. 70, no. 3, ISSN 0924-4247, pages 250 - 259, XP004140058 [A] 1-5,7,9-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0924-4247(98)00142-3 | [A] - PETERSEN K E, "SILICON AS A MECHANICAL MATERIAL", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE,US,IEEE. NEW YORK, (19820501), vol. 70, no. 5, ISSN 0018-9219, pages 420 - 457, XP000565139 [A] 1-5,7,9-18 * column W * |