EP1214533 - CONTINUOUS VARIABLE TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamapro Holding B.V. Nijverheidsweg 12 8084 GW 't Harde / NL | [2004/12] |
Former [2002/25] | For all designated states Hamapro Holding B.V. Nijverheidsweg 12 8084 GW t'Harde / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOOGENBERG, Heerke Groenling 11 NL-7463 BH Rijssen / NL | [2002/25] | Representative(s) | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacob Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacob Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2002/25] | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacob Arnold & Siedsma, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 00957144.9 | 25.08.2000 | [2002/25] | WO2000NL00594 | Priority number, date | NL19991013046 | 15.09.1999 Original published format: NL 1013046 | NL20001014153 | 24.01.2000 Original published format: NL 1014153 | NL20001014505 | 25.02.2000 Original published format: NL 1014505 | [2002/25] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0120193 | Date: | 22.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1214533 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1214533 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16H15/42 | [2002/25] | CPC: |
F16H15/42 (EP,US);
F16H15/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/12] |
Former [2002/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STUFENLOS REGELBARES GETRIEBE | [2002/25] | English: | CONTINUOUS VARIABLE TRANSMISSION | [2002/25] | French: | TRANSMISSION VARIABLE ET CONTINUE | [2002/25] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2001 | Translation filed | 03.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/25] | 28.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/10] | Request for further processing for: | 13.06.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 13.06.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.07.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.03.2004 | CH | 17.03.2004 | CY | 17.03.2004 | FI | 17.03.2004 | LI | 17.03.2004 | DK | 17.06.2004 | GR | 17.06.2004 | IE | 25.08.2004 | LU | 25.08.2004 | MC | 31.08.2004 | [2007/08] |
Former [2005/46] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
IE | 25.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 17.03.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR608487 (VIZET ALPHONSE [FR]) [A] 1,9 * figure - *; | [A]US2325323 (JOHNSON CARL E, et al) [A] 1,9* figure - *; | [A]US2336799 (PALM BERNHARD N) [A] 1,9 * figure - *; | [A]DE812618 (BIASI KARL) [A] 1,9 * figure - *; | [DA]EP0688407 (HOOGENBERG HEERKE [NL]) [DA] 1,9 * figure 1 * |