|
11.05.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2009 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.05.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2008 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.10.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2008 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2008 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
13.03.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.03.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
56 |
|
11.03.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
11.03.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
17.01.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
12 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
9 |
|
02.10.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2007 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.09.2007 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.09.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.09.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.08.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Fax filed during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.12.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.09.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
30.07.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
27.07.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
27.07.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
01.07.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.09.2004 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2004 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2004 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.05.2004 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
21.04.2004 |
Preparation of grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
08.01.2004 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.01.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.01.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
04.11.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2002 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2002 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2002 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.11.2001 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.11.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.11.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.11.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
06.11.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
06.11.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.11.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.11.2001 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.11.2001 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.10.2001 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.10.2001 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.08.2001 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.07.2001 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
05.04.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
13.03.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.03.2001 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.03.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.02.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
22.02.2001 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
16.10.2000 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.10.2000 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
16.10.2000 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
16 |
|
16.10.2000 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
11.08.2000 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |