EP1261676 - HYDROFLUOROETHER AS A HEAT-TRANSFER FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOUSIGNANT, Lew, A. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
TUMA, Phillip, E. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2002/49] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/49] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00967175.1 | 29.09.2000 | [2002/49] | WO2000US26968 | Priority number, date | US19990158697P | 08.10.1999 Original published format: US 158697 P | US20000661935 | 14.09.2000 Original published format: US 661935 | [2002/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0127217 | Date: | 19.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1261676 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1261676 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/10 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
C09K5/10 (EP,KR,US);
C07C19/08 (KR);
C07C43/12 (KR);
H01L21/67098 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2002/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDROFLUORETHER ALS WÄRMEÜBERTRAGUNGSFLÜSSIGKEIT | [2002/49] | English: | HYDROFLUOROETHER AS A HEAT-TRANSFER FLUID | [2002/49] | French: | HYDROFLUOROETHER UTILISE COMME FLUIDE DE TRANSFERT DE CHALEUR | [2002/49] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/49] | 16.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9714762 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1,8* claim - *; | [A]WO9937598 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1 * page 10, line 16 - line 29 * * page 1 *; | [PX] - TUMA PHILLIP E ET AL, "New 'green' heat transfer fluids", SOLID STATE TECHNOL;SOLID STATE TECHNOLOGY 2000 PENNWELL PUBL CO, NASHUA, NH, USA, (2000), vol. 43, no. 6, pages 175 - 176, 178, 180, 182, XP002157456 [PX] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - D.B. BIVENS, B.H. MINOR, "Fluoroethers and other next-generation fluids", ASHRAE/NIST REFRIGERANTS CONFERENCE, pages 122 - 134, XP000979604 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [DA] - G. MARCHIONNI ET AL., "Hydrofluoropolyethers", JOURNAL OF FLUORINE CHEMISTRY, XP000978487 [DA] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1139(98)00297-8 |