EP1244698 - NOVEL HUMAN TRANSPORTER PROTEINS AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lexicon Genetics Incorporated 4000 Research Forest Drive The Woodlands, TX 77381 / US | [2002/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARRAS, Marie 28717 Driftwood Lane Spring, TX 77381 / US | 02 /
DONOHO, Gregory 6594 Pleasantview Drive Portage, MI 49024 / US | 03 /
TURNER, C., Alexander, Jr. 67 Winter Wheat Place The Woodlands, TX 77381 / US | 04 /
NEHLS, Michael Paul-Keller-Strasse 6 82131 Stockdorf / DE | 05 /
FRIEDRICH, Glenn, Breland & Breland 2207 Hermann Drive Houston, TX 77004 / US | 06 /
ZAMBROWICZ, Brian 18 Firethorne Place The Woodlands, TX 77382 / US | 07 /
SANDS, Arthur, T. 163 Bristol Bend Circle The Woodlands, TX 77382 / US | [2002/48] |
Former [2002/40] | 01 /
HARRAS, Marie 28717 Driftwood Lane Spring, TX 77381 / US | ||
02 /
DONOHO, Gregory 41 Fallenstone Drive The Woodlands, TX 77381 / US | |||
03 /
TURNER, C., Alexander, Jr. 67 Winter Wheat Place The Woodlands, TX 77381 / US | |||
04 /
NEHLS, Michael Paul-Keller-Strasse 6 82131 Stockdorf / DE | |||
05 /
FRIEDRICH, Glenn, Breland & Breland 2207 Hermann Drive Houston, TX 77004 / US | |||
06 /
ZAMBROWICZ, Brian 18 Firethorne Place The Woodlands, TX 77382 / US | |||
07 /
SANDS, Arthur, T. 163 Bristol Bend Circle The Woodlands, TX 77382 / US | Representative(s) | Silveston, Judith, et al ABEL & IMRAY 20 Red Lion Street London, WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/40] | Silveston, Judith, et al ABEL & IMRAY 20 Red Lion Street London, WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00976697.3 | 31.10.2000 | [2002/40] | WO2000US29852 | Priority number, date | US19990163018P | 02.11.1999 Original published format: US 163018 P | [2002/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0132706 | Date: | 10.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1244698 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47, C12N15/11 | [2002/40] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE MENSCHLICHE TRANSPORTERPROTEINE UND DAFÜR KODIERENDE POLYNUCLEOTIDE | [2002/40] | English: | NOVEL HUMAN TRANSPORTER PROTEINS AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING THE SAME | [2002/40] | French: | NOUVELLES PROTEINES HUMAINES TRANSPORTEUSES ET POLYNUCLEOTIDES CODANT POUR CES MEMES PROTEINES | [2002/40] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.05.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 03.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/06] | 18.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5882926 (AMARA SUSAN G [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * | [X] - POUSTKA ET AL., "Homo sapiens mRNA", EMBL, (19990915), XP002163083 [X] 1 * abstract * | Examination | WO0224742 |