|
29.11.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2012 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2012 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2012 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.09.2012 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.09.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.08.2012 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2012 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.08.2012 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.08.2012 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
07.08.2012 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.05.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
26.03.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
21 |
|
17.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.02.2012 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.12.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.12.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
23.12.2011 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.11.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2011 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
30.11.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.11.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
25.11.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2010 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
28.09.2010 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2010 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.09.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.08.2010 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.08.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.2010 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
31.03.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
29.03.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.03.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
25.01.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2010 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.01.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2010 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.01.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.11.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
16 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.09.2009 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.09.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
07.09.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
07.09.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.09.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
02.09.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.09.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.06.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.06.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.01.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
22.12.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
20.11.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2006 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.11.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
05.10.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Description |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
18.05.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
50 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
07.12.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
27.04.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2005 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
23.11.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
29.09.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.08.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
21.07.2004 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
30.06.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.03.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.11.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2003 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2003 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.04.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.04.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2003 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2003 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2003 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2003 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2003 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2003 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
56 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.06.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.08.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
07.08.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
26.07.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.07.2001 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2001 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
52 |