EP1232379 - CAPACITIVE SENSOR ON A TRANSPARENT CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.2005 [2005/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PLATZ, Karl-Otto Auf den Pühlen 5 51674 Wiehl-Bomig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states Platz, Karl-Otto Auf den Pühlen 5 51674 Wiehl-Bomig / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/34] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | Dallmeyer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 00985101.5 | 27.11.2000 | [2002/34] | WO2000EP11857 | Priority number, date | DE1999220733U | 26.11.1999 Original published format: DE 29920733 U | [2002/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0138841 | Date: | 31.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1232379 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1232379 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01L1/14 | [2002/34] | CPC: |
G01D5/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2004/10] |
Former [2002/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | KAPAZITIVER SENSOR AUF TRANSPARENTEM TRÄGER | [2002/34] | English: | CAPACITIVE SENSOR ON A TRANSPARENT CARRIER | [2002/34] | French: | DETECTEUR CAPACITIF SUR SUPPORT TRANSPARENT | [2002/34] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/34] | 20.08.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 03.06.2004 | [2004/40] | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH01167731 ; | [A]JPH05204546 ; | [A]US4290052 (EICHELBERGER CHARLES W, et al) [A] 1 * claims 1-5 *; | [A]DE3111696 (VER GLASWERKE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 10 - page 16 *; | [A]EP0348229 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-14 *; | [Y]US5317919 (AWTREY JAMES D [US]) [Y] 1-10 * claims 1-21 *; | [A]US5446616 (WARREN KEITH O [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 3 - column 5 *; | [A]WO9615464 (MOONSTONE TECHN LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 17 - page 28 *; | [A]US5824902 (CORKUM DAVID L [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 4 - column 7 *; | [A]US5869791 (YOUNG NIGEL D [GB]) [A] 1-15 * column 6 - column 11 *; | [Y]US5952998 (CLANCY KEVIN F [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 3 - column 4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891003), vol. 013, no. 438, Database accession no. (P - 939), & JP01167731 A 19890703 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980331), vol. 1998, no. 07, & JP05204546 A 19930813 (INTERNATL BUSINESS MACH CORP |