EP1259492 - SUBSTITUTED PIPERAZINE DERIVATIVES AS MTP INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55218 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co.KG Binger Strasse 173 55218 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma KG 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HECKEL, Armin Geschwister-Scholl-Strasse 71 88400 Biberach / DE | 02 /
LEHMANN-LINTZ, Thorsten Lindenweg 27 88416 Ochsenhausen/Laubach / DE | 03 /
THOMAS, Leo Georg-Schinbain-Strasse 221 88400 Biberach / DE | 04 /
MARK, Michael Hugo-Häring-Strasse 50 88400 Biberach / DE | [2002/48] | Application number, filing date | 00987409.0 | 16.12.2000 | [2002/48] | WO2000EP12842 | Priority number, date | DE1999163235 | 27.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19963235 | [2002/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0147899 | Date: | 05.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1259492 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D241/04, A61P7/00, A61K31/495, C07D405/06, C07D243/08, A61K31/55, C07D401/06 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
C07D233/64 (EP,US);
C07D403/06 (KR);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
C07D209/18 (EP,US);
C07D213/56 (EP,US);
C07D219/02 (EP,US);
C07D241/08 (EP,US);
C07D243/08 (EP,US);
C07D295/185 (EP,US);
C07D295/192 (EP,US);
C07D295/205 (EP,US);
C07D295/215 (EP,US);
C07D295/26 (EP,US);
C07D311/84 (EP,US);
C07D317/60 (EP,US);
C07C2601/02 (EP,US);
C07C2601/08 (EP,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US);
C07C2602/10 (EP,US);
C07C2603/18 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 29.07.2002 | LV | 29.07.2002 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 29.07.2002 | SI | 29.07.2002 | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE PIPERAZINDERIVATE ALS INHIBITOREN DES MTP | [2002/48] | English: | SUBSTITUTED PIPERAZINE DERIVATIVES AS MTP INHIBITORS | [2002/48] | French: | DERIVES DE PIPERAZINE SUBSTITUES UTILISES COMME INHIBITEURS DE LA PROTEINE DE TRANSFERT TRIGLYCERIDE MICROSOMALE | [2002/48] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 01.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/01] | 05.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5712279 (BILLER SCOTT A [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * claim 1 *; | [A]US5885983 (BILLER SCOTT A [US], et al) [A] 1-10* claim 1 *; | [A]US5965577 (TINO JOSEPH A [US]) [A] 1-10 * claim 1 * |