EP1179698 - EXPANDED GRAPHITE-MADE KNITTING YARN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.2009 [2009/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON PILLAR PACKING CO., LTD. 11-48, Nonakaminami 2-chome, Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 532-0022 / JP | [2002/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJIWARA, Masaru c/o Nippon Pillar Packing Co., Ltd. Sanda Factory 541-1, Aza-Utsuba, Shimouchigami Sanda-shi, Hyogo 669-1333 / JP | 02 /
UEDA, Takahisa c/o Nippon Pillar Packing Co., Ltd. Sanda Factory 541-1, Aza-Utsuba, Shimouchigami Sanda-shi, Hyogo 669-1333 / JP | [2007/31] |
Former [2002/07] | 01 /
FUJIWARA, Masaru, Nippon Pillar Packing Co., Ltd. Sanda Factory, 541-1, Aza-Utsuba, Shimouchigami Sanda-shi, Hyogo 669-1333 / JP | ||
02 /
UEDA, Takahisa, Nippon Pillar Packing Co., Ltd. Sanda Factory, 541-1, Aza-Utsuba, Shimouchigami Sanda-shi, Hyogo 669-1333 / JP | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechsanwälte Steinerstraße 15/Haus A 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sollner Strasse 36 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/04] | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/07] | Fleuchaus, Leo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00987725.9 | 25.12.2000 | [2002/07] | WO2000JP09176 | Priority number, date | JP19990369910 | 27.12.1999 Original published format: JP 36991099 | [2002/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0148402 | Date: | 05.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1179698 | Date: | 13.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1179698 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.07.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/22 | [2002/07] | CPC: |
F16J15/22 (EP,KR,US);
D02G3/02 (KR);
D04B1/225 (EP);
D04C1/12 (EP);
D10B2101/12 (EP);
D10B2101/20 (EP);
D10B2505/06 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2002/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | STRICKGARN AUS EXPANDIERTEM GRAPHIT | [2002/07] | English: | EXPANDED GRAPHITE-MADE KNITTING YARN | [2002/07] | French: | FIL DE TRICOTAGE A BASE DE GRAPHITE EXPANSE | [2002/07] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2001 | Translation filed | 26.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2001 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/07] | 12.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0388481 (ZHEJIANG CI XI SEAL MATERIAL F [CN]) [A] 3,4 * abstract ** example 3 *; | [X]US5225262 (LEDUC ROBERT D [US]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 11 * * figure 5 *; | [A]GB2285067 (T & N TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * pages 5,6 * * figures 5,6 *; | [X]US5605341 (UEDA TAKAHISA [JP]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * figures 6,7 *; | [X]EP0849219 (NIPPON PILLAR PACKING [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-7 * abstract * * example 3 * * figure 9 * | International search | [A]JPH06279752 (NIPPON PILLAR PACKING) |