EP1205405 - INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM AND ACCESS DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/20] | INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM, NONCONTACT IC TAG, ACCESS DEVICE, ACCESS SYSTEM, LIFE CYCLE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM, INPUT/OUTPUT METHOD, AND ACCESS METHOD | ||
[2006/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2002/20] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAMAI, Seiichiro 18-14, Kofudai 6-chome Toyono-cho Toyonogun Osaka 563-0104 / JP | 02 /
MICHISAKA, Shinichi Room A-206 7-25, Hiyoshidai Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-1022 / JP | [2002/20] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/20] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 00987756.4 | 26.12.2000 | [2002/20] | WO2000JP09283 | Priority number, date | JP19990373880 | 28.12.1999 Original published format: JP 37388099 | JP20000037134 | 15.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000037134 | [2002/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0147789 | Date: | 05.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1205405 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1205405 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.07.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/00, G06K19/07, B65G1/137, G07F7/10, G06F12/14, G08B13/24, H04B1/38, H01Q1/22 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
G06F12/1466 (EP,US);
G06F21/79 (EP,US);
G06K19/0723 (EP,US);
G06K19/07758 (EP,US);
G06Q10/08 (EP,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3674 (EP,US);
G06Q20/4097 (EP,US);
G07C3/00 (EP,US);
G07C9/28 (EP,US);
G07F7/02 (EP,US);
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
H04W12/086 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2103 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2129 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/20] | B65G1/137, G06K19/00, G06K17/00, G06F17/60 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/34] |
Former [2004/20] | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | ||
Former [2002/20] | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSAUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM UND ZUGANGSEINRICHTUNG | [2006/24] | English: | INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM AND ACCESS DEVICE | [2006/24] | French: | SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT DE DONNEES ET DISPOSITIF D'ACCES | [2006/24] |
Former [2002/20] | INFORMATIONSAUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM, TRANSPONDER, ZUGANGSEINRICHTUNG UND -SYSTEM, LEBENSZYKLUSVERWALTUNG, EINGANGS/AUSGANGSVERFAHREN UND ZUGANGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2002/20] | INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM, NONCONTACT IC TAG, ACCESS DEVICE, ACCESS SYSTEM, LIFE CYCLE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM, INPUT/OUTPUT METHOD, AND ACCESS METHOD | ||
Former [2002/20] | SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT DE DONNEES, ETIQUETTE SANS CONTACT A CIRCUIT INTEGRE, DISPOSITIF D'ACCES, SYSTEME D'ACCES, SYSTEME DE GESTION DE CYCLE DE VIE, PROCEDE D'ENTREE/SORTIE ET PROCEDE D'ACCES | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2001 | Translation filed | 18.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2001 | Search fee paid | 18.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/20] | 22.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.03.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0856818 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-25 * column W *; | [Y]DE19522050 (UESTRA HANNOVERSCHE VERKEHRSBE [DE]) [Y] 1-25 * abstract * * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 56; figure 3; claim 2 *; | [Y]EP0713188 (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG [DE]) [Y] 1-25 * column 4, line 42 - line 50 * * column 6, line 30 - line 43 *; | [Y]EP0923056 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [AD]JPH10222568 ; | [AD]JPH08276458 ; | [AD]JPH11120308 ; | [AP]US6094639 (KUBOTA MICHITAKA [JP]) [AP] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10222568 A 19980821 (HITACHI LTD) [AD] 1-25 * abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, & JP08276458 A 19961022 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [AD] 1-25 * abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990730), vol. 1999, no. 09, & JP11120308 A 19990430 (SONY CORP) [AD] 1-25 * abstract * | [A] - SCHÜLER, PETER, "Schnüffeltechnik ausgetrickst: Ein Störsender verwirrt RFID-Lesegeräte (RFID-Blocker)", C'T, Heise-Verlag, Hannover, (20040308), no. 6/04, page 40, XP002272800 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH10222568 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JPH11120308 (SONY CORP); | [A]JPH10133578 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JPH11180545 (TEN TAC KK); | [A]JPH11175402 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]JPH06309528 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH11328326 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |