|
16.11.2011 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2010 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
17 |
|
20.09.2010 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.08.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.08.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.03.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.03.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2010 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2010 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.02.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.02.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2010 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
7 |
|
03.02.2010 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2009 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2007 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.08.2007 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2007 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
27.07.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
23.05.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.04.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2007 |
Decision to refuse according to the state of the file |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2007 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2007 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2007 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2007 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2007 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2007 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.11.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.10.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.09.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.07.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.03.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.11.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
05.11.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
05.11.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.09.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2002 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
01.07.2002 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2002 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.12.2001 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.12.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.12.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.12.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
03.12.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
03.12.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
03.12.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
03.12.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.12.2001 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.10.2001 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.10.2001 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.2001 |
Notification of defects in the demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
03.08.2001 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.08.2001 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
03.08.2001 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.07.2001 |
Urgent incoming letter |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
22.06.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.06.2001 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.06.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.06.2001 |
Urgent incoming letter |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.05.2001 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.05.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
07.05.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.04.2001 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
24.01.2001 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.01.2001 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
24.01.2001 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
17 |
|
24.01.2001 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
4 |