EP1243011 - CONTACTOR WITH A FRONT MASK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2004 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS 89 boulevard Franklin Roosevelt 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 89, boulevard Franklin Roosevelt 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | ||
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SA 89 boulevard Franklin Roosevelt 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALEXANDRE, Pascal Hameau de Beulle, Chemin rural 59 F-78580 Maule / FR | 02 /
PERROCHEAU, Régis 2, rue Jean de Thenissey F-21560 Couternon / FR | [2002/48] |
Former [2002/39] | 01 /
ALEXANDRE, Pascal 10, rue de la Chapelle F-21310 Arceau / FR | ||
02 /
PERROCHEAU, Régis 2, rue Jean de Thenissey F-21560 Couternon / FR | Representative(s) | Carias, Alain 89, boulevard F. Roosevelt, B.P. 50602 92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | Carias, Alain 89, boulevard F. Roosevelt, B.P. 50602 92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 00993754.1 | 26.12.2000 | [2002/39] | WO2000FR03688 | Priority number, date | FR19990016805 | 30.12.1999 Original published format: FR 9916805 | [2002/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0150489 | Date: | 12.07.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1243011 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1243011 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01H50/02, H01H9/28 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
H01H50/326 (EP,US);
H01H9/287 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI [2003/29] |
Former [2002/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUTZ MIT FRONTMASKE | [2002/39] | English: | CONTACTOR WITH A FRONT MASK | [2002/39] | French: | CONTACTEUR A MASQUE FRONTAL | [2002/39] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/39] | 28.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2199185 (ITT FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 19 - page 2, line 29 *; | [A]DE2950438 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 5 - line 10 *; | [A]DE29615689U (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1* page 3, line 5 - line 23 * |