blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1137273

EP1137273 - Method for controlling a television receiver and television receiver for implementing the method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  20.06.2008
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip13.03.2020Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: TR
published on 15.04.2020  [2020/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Loewe Opta GmbH
Industriestrasse 11
96317 Kronach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/39]For all designated states
LOEWE OPTA GmbH
Industriestrasse 11
96317 Kronach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Grinberg, Anna
Bleriotstrasse 38
86159 Augsburg / DE
02 / Maryniok, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
Kuhbergstrasse 21
96317 Kronach / DE
 [2001/39]
Application number, filing date01100070.010.01.2001
[2001/39]
Priority number, dateDE2000100064211.01.2000         Original published format: DE 10000642
[2001/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1137273
Date:26.09.2001
Language:DE
[2001/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1137273
Date:10.10.2001
[2001/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1137273
Date:02.01.2003
Language:DE
[2003/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.08.2001
ClassificationIPC:H04N5/44, H04N5/50
[2001/41]
CPC:
H04N5/44 (EP); H04N21/44222 (EP,US); H04N21/4383 (EP);
H04N21/482 (EP)
Former IPC [2001/39]H04N5/44
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/27]
Former [2001/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Steuerung eines Fernsehempfängers und Fernsehempfänger zur Durchführung des Verfahrens[2001/39]
English:Method for controlling a television receiver and television receiver for implementing the method[2001/39]
French:Procédé de commande d'un récepteur de télévision et récepteur de télévision pour la mise en oeuvre dudit procédé[2001/39]
Examination procedure18.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/50]
18.09.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
28.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.12.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
22.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.09.2002Fee for grant paid
21.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  01.10.2003  26.01.2005  WITHDRAWN
Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH
Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74
30625 Hannover / DE
Opponent's representative
Rossmanith, Manfred
Deutsche Thomson OHG
Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D
30625 Hannover / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/39]
Opponent(s)01  01.10.2003  26.01.2005  WITHDRAWN
Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH
Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74
30625 Hannover / DE
Opponent's representative
Rossmanith, Manfred
Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74
30625 Hannover / DE
Former [2005/12]
Opponent(s)01  01.10.2003  26.01.2005  WITHDRAWN
Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH
Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74
30625 Hannover / DE
Opponent's representative
Rossmanith, Manfred, Dr.
Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, Licensing & Intellectual Property, Postfach 61 01 31
30601 Hannover / DE
Former [2003/48]
Opponent(s)01  01.10.2003   
Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH
Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74
30625 Hannover / DE
Opponent's representative
Rossmanith, Manfred, Dr.
Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, Licensing & Intellectual Property, Postfach 61 01 31
30601 Hannover / DE
07.11.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.01.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.06.2004Date of oral proceedings
21.06.2004Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
28.06.2004Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
02.04.2008Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/30]
Appeal following opposition09.07.2004Appeal received No.  T0899/04
22.10.2004Statement of grounds filed
02.04.2008Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
02.04.2008Date of oral proceedings
07.04.2008Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI02.01.2003
GR02.01.2003
IE02.01.2003
NL02.01.2003
CY10.01.2003
LU10.01.2003
BE31.01.2003
MC31.01.2003
PT02.04.2003
SE02.04.2003
CH31.01.2005
LI31.01.2005
[2020/16]
Former [2007/20]FI02.01.2003
GR02.01.2003
IE02.01.2003
NL02.01.2003
CY10.01.2003
LU10.01.2003
BE31.01.2003
MC31.01.2003
PT02.04.2003
SE02.04.2003
TR10.01.2004
CH31.01.2005
LI31.01.2005
Former [2006/14]FI02.01.2003
GR02.01.2003
IE02.01.2003
NL02.01.2003
CY10.01.2003
LU10.01.2003
BE31.01.2003
MC31.01.2003
PT02.04.2003
SE02.04.2003
CH31.01.2005
LI31.01.2005
Former [2005/02]FI02.01.2003
GR02.01.2003
IE02.01.2003
NL02.01.2003
CY10.01.2003
LU10.01.2003
BE31.01.2003
MC31.01.2003
PT02.04.2003
SE02.04.2003
Former [2004/44]FI02.01.2003
GR02.01.2003
IE02.01.2003
NL02.01.2003
CY10.01.2003
LU10.01.2003
BE31.01.2003
PT02.04.2003
SE02.04.2003
Former [2004/39]FI02.01.2003
GR02.01.2003
IE02.01.2003
NL02.01.2003
LU10.01.2003
BE31.01.2003
PT02.04.2003
SE02.04.2003
Former [2004/28]FI02.01.2003
GR02.01.2003
IE02.01.2003
NL02.01.2003
BE31.01.2003
PT02.04.2003
SE02.04.2003
Former [2004/01]FI02.01.2003
GR02.01.2003
IE02.01.2003
NL02.01.2003
PT02.04.2003
SE02.04.2003
Former [2003/46]FI02.01.2003
GR02.01.2003
NL02.01.2003
PT02.04.2003
SE02.04.2003
Former [2003/43]FI02.01.2003
NL02.01.2003
PT02.04.2003
SE02.04.2003
Former [2003/41]FI02.01.2003
NL02.01.2003
SE02.04.2003
Former [2003/30]SE02.04.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]US4162513  (BEYERS BILLY W JR [US], et al) [A] 4 * column 4, line 4 - column 5, line 36 *;
 [A]US4271532  (WINE CHARLES M) [A] 1-3,5-8 * column 2, line 13 - column 6, line 47 *;
 [A]US4367559  (TULTS JURI) [A] 1-3,5-8 * column W *;
 [A]EP0366001  (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US]) [A] 1-3,5-8 * column 2, line 51 - column 7, line 32 *;
 [A]EP0477753  (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US]) [A] 1-3,5-8 * column 3, line 16 - column 7, line 53 *;
 [A]WO9734414  (GUIDE E INC [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5-8 * page 3, line 12 - page 9, line 38 *;
 [E]DE19933422  (RUNDFUNKSCHUTZRECHTE EV [DE]) [E] 1-9* column 1, line 1 - column 8, line 59 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.