|
16.10.2008 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.10.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2008 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.08.2008 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.08.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
24.07.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
30.06.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.05.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2008 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.05.2008 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
29.04.2008 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.02.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.11.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
04.09.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
02.01.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
07.09.2006 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
12.07.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.06.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
8 |
|
05.04.2006 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.03.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2006 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.02.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2006 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2006 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2006 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
8 |
|
05.12.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2005 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.11.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.2005 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.2005 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.06.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2005 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
08.04.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2004 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
10.03.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
03.12.2003 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2003 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.12.2003 |
Invitation to file a translation of the previous application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
22.09.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.09.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.05.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2002 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.10.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.10.2002 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
04.10.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.05.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2002 |
Communication concerning non paid of designation fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2001 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2001 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2001 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2001 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2001 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2001 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.02.2001 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2001 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.02.2001 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
14 |