EP1126229 - Wall fittings for pipe systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.08.2003 [2003/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebr. Kemper GmbH + Co. KG Harkortstrasse 5 57462 Olpe / DE | [2001/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keine, Ulrich Reeper Höhe 11 57439 Attendorn / DE | 02 /
Petzolt, Ulrich Wiehtfeld 1 57439 Attendorn-Beukenbeul / DE | [2001/34] | Representative(s) | Pürckhauer, Rolf Am Rosenwald 25 57234 Wilnsdorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/34] | Pürckhauer, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing. Am Rosenwald 25 57234 Wilnsdorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 01103789.2 | 16.02.2001 | [2001/34] | Priority number, date | DE2000107519 | 18.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10007519 | [2001/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1126229 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1126229 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | [2003/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F28F9/26, F24H9/12 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
E03C1/021 (EP);
F24D19/0002 (EP);
F24D19/0065 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/34] | F28F9/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wandanschluss für Rohrsysteme | [2001/34] | English: | Wall fittings for pipe systems | [2001/34] | French: | Robinetterie murale pour tuyauteries | [2001/34] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3435262 (SCHULZ ULRICH ING GRAD) [AD] 1,8-10,12,13 * figures 1-3; claims 1-3,7,8,14 *; | [AD]DE3310138 (THYSSEN PLASTIK ANGER KG [DE]) [AD] 1,5,9,10,13,14 * page 2 - page 5; figure 4; claim 1 *; | [A]DE3148187 (HUSSAUF WALTER) [A] 1,2,5,7,9-11,13 * figures 1-3; claims 1-3 *; | [A]CH676146 (VIEGENER II FA FRANZ) [A] 1,2 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]CH659310 (TOUR & ANDERSSON AB) [A] 1,5,12-14 * figures 1-3; claims 1-5 *; | [A]DE29823158U (PENZKOFER LUDWIG [DE]) [A] 1,5,7,12,13 * the whole document * |