EP1127966 - Drawing mechanism for spinning machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.12.2004 [2004/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saurer GmbH & Co. KG Landgrafenstrasse 45 41069 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2004/14] |
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states Zinser Textilmaschinen GmbH Postfach 14 80 D-73058 Ebersbach/Fils / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dinkelmann, Friedrich Stuifenstrasse 12 73098 Rechberghausen / DE | 02 /
Olbrich, Andreas, Dr. Metzgerstrasse 7 73230 Kirchheim / DE | [2003/20] |
Former [2002/51] | 01 /
Dinkelmann, Friedrich Stuifenstrasse 12 73098 Rechberghausen / DE | ||
02 /
Olbrich, Andreas, Dr. Metzgerstrasse 7 73230 Kirchheim / DE | |||
03 /
Dr. Artzt, Peter Hugo-Wolf-str.16 72766 Reutlingen / DE | |||
04 /
Steinbach, Günter Hechinger Str. 29 72770 Reutlingen / DE | |||
Former [2001/35] | 01 /
Dinkelmann, Friedrich Stuifenstrasse 12 73098 Rechberghausen / DE | ||
02 /
Olbrich, Andreas, Dr. Metzgerstrasse 7 73230 Kirchheim / DE | |||
03 /
Artzt, Peter, Dr. Hugo-Wolf-Strasse 16 72766 Reutlingen / DE | |||
04 /
Steinbach, Günter Hechinger Strasse 29 72770 Reutlingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01103901.3 | 17.02.2001 | [2001/35] | Priority number, date | DE2000108610 | 24.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10008610 | [2001/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1127966 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1127966 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | D01H5/86, D01H5/72 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
D01H5/72 (EP,US);
D01H5/26 (EP,US);
D01H5/86 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, IT, LI [2002/21] |
Former [2001/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Streckwerk für eine Spinnereimaschine | [2001/35] | English: | Drawing mechanism for spinning machines | [2001/35] | French: | Système d'étirage pour métiers à filer | [2001/35] | Examination procedure | 16.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/50] | 05.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02023162.7 / EP1312704 | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4426249 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 65 - column 3, line 48; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE19547462 (ZINSER TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [DA]DE19815325 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]) [DA] 1-11 * the whole document * |