|
10.03.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.09.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
8 |
|
31.07.2009 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.06.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.06.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.03.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2009 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
31 |
|
12.03.2009 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2007 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2007 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2007 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.05.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.03.2007 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2007 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.12.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.12.2006 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2006 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.12.2006 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.12.2006 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2006 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2006 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
26.10.2006 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2006 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2006 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2006 |
Invitation to file an authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.06.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.03.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.03.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2002 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2002 |
Note on telephone consultation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2002 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2002 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.12.2001 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2001 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2001 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2001 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2001 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
24.10.2001 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2001 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
05.04.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
21.02.2001 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.02.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
21.02.2001 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2001 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
21.02.2001 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |