EP1134479 - Burn through resistant nonwoven mat, barrier, and insulation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johns Manville International, Inc. 717 17th Street Denver, CO 80202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/33] | For all designated states Johns Manville International, Inc. 717 17th Street Denver Colorado 80202 / US | ||
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states Johns Manville International, Inc. 717 17th Street Denver, Colorado 80202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fay, Ralph Michael 2249 South Hoyt Court Lakewood, Colorado 80227 / US | 02 /
Wulliman, Rebecca S. 6589 East Lake Place Englewood, Colorado 80111 / US | [2001/38] | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/38] | Grättinger & Partner (GbR) Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01105521.7 | 06.03.2001 | [2001/38] | Priority number, date | US20000524404 | 13.03.2000 Original published format: US 524404 | [2001/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1134479 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1134479 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | [2003/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1134479 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16L59/02, B64C1/40, B60R13/08 | [2001/38] | CPC: |
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
B64C1/40 (EP,US);
D04H1/4209 (EP,US);
D04H1/4218 (EP,US);
D04H1/43 (EP,US);
D04H1/43828 (EP,US);
D04H1/43835 (EP,US);
D04H1/43838 (EP,US);
F16L59/026 (EP,US);
E04B1/94 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2164 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2189 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/01] |
Former [2001/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Gegen Durchbrennen widerstandsfähige, nicht gewebte Matte, Sperrschicht und Dämmsystem | [2001/38] | English: | Burn through resistant nonwoven mat, barrier, and insulation system | [2001/38] | French: | Matelas non-tissé résistant au feu, barrière, et système d'isolation | [2001/38] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/26] | 13.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5169700 (MEIER SPENCER I [US], et al) [Y] 7,8,13-16,21-24,29-33,39-42,47-50 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5250488 (THELOHAN SYLVIE [FR], et al) [Y] 9,11-24,34-50* the whole document *; | [Y]US5332698 (NYSSEN PETER R [DE], et al) [Y] 3,4,11,19,20,25-28,33,37,45,46 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5595817 (SCHAEFER WERNER [DE], et al) [Y] 7,8,15,16,23,24,31,32,41,42,49,50 * the whole document *; | [XY]US5947158 (GROSS STEPHEN EDWARD [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,10 * column 6, line 28 - column 6, line 53; figures 1-7; claims 6,7 * [Y] 3,4,7-9,11-50 |