EP1160700 - Brokerage device and system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.01.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2007 | Refusal of application | published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hähle, Jörg Habacher Strasse 70 81377 München / DE | [2001/49] | Application number, filing date | 01105593.6 | 06.03.2001 | [2001/49] | Priority number, date | DE2000123359 | 12.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10023359 | [2001/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1160700 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1160700 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | [2004/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
G06Q40/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/50] |
Former [2001/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Maklereinrichtung und Maklersystem | [2001/49] | English: | Brokerage device and system | [2001/49] | French: | Dispositif et système de courtage | [2001/49] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 10.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.10.2006 | 18.09.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 09.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/09] | 19.10.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.10.2006 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | Examination | US5915001 |