|
21.03.2014 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2013 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2013 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2013 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2013 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
05.12.2012 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
31.08.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
19 |
|
24.08.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
8 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.06.2012 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
13.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.06.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.10.2011 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2011 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2010 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.04.2010 |
Annex |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.04.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.03.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.02.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.02.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2009 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2009 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.10.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.05.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.04.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2009 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2009 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2009 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2008 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2008 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2007 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2007 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2003 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2003 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2002 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2002 |
Communication concerning non paid of designation fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2002 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2002 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2001 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2001 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2001 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2001 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2001 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.03.2001 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
13.03.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.03.2001 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |