EP1251343 - Method and device for mechanical stresses measurement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Makarov, Vladimir Kubanskya Strasse 24 664009 Irkutsk City / RU | For all designated states Demine, Constantin Androvova prospekt 30,; Flat 151 115487 Moscow / RU | [2002/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/43] | Representative(s) | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/43] | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf SA 25, Avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 01109749.0 | 20.04.2001 | [2002/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1251343 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1251343 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01N3/42, G01N3/48, G01L5/00, G01M7/08 | [2002/43] | CPC: |
G01N3/42 (EP);
G01L5/0052 (EP);
G01M7/08 (EP);
G01N3/34 (EP);
G01N2203/0016 (EP);
G01N2203/0019 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Messung von mechanischen Spannungen | [2002/43] | English: | Method and device for mechanical stresses measurement | [2002/43] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour mesurer des contraintes mécaniques | [2002/43] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/26] | 08.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.2006 | BE | 08.03.2006 | CY | 08.03.2006 | FI | 08.03.2006 | IT | 08.03.2006 | NL | 08.03.2006 | TR | 08.03.2006 | IE | 20.04.2006 | LU | 20.04.2006 | MC | 30.04.2006 | DK | 08.06.2006 | GB | 08.06.2006 | SE | 08.06.2006 | GR | 09.06.2006 | ES | 19.06.2006 | PT | 08.08.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
TR | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 20.04.2006 | ||
LU | 20.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
GB | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
GR | 09.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 20.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
GB | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
GR | 09.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 20.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
GB | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 20.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
GB | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 20.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 20.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 08.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3930483 (ARTEMEV JURIJ GEORGIEVIC [SU], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * column 3, line 36 - column 7, line 60 *; | [A]US5841019 (DRABKIN SERGEY [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract ** column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 25 *; | [A]US6155104 (SURESH SUBRA [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * column 7, line 15 - line 21 * * column 9, line 5 - column 10, line 51 * |