|
18.05.2021 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2021 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
21.04.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.04.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.04.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2021 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.04.2021 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.04.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2021 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2021 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2021 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2021 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2020 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2020 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.06.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.06.2020 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2020 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2020 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2020 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2020 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.03.2020 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.03.2020 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
26.03.2020 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2020 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2020 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2020 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
11.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
09.01.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.2020 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.01.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.01.2020 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
12 |
|
04.12.2019 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2019 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.01.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
30.10.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
25.10.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.10.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.10.2018 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
07.03.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
30.01.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2017 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2017 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.2017 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
30.06.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
12.04.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2016 |
F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2016 |
F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2016 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2016 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2016 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
04.03.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.01.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2016 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.01.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2015 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
15 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
25 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
53 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
53 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
12.08.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.06.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.04.2015 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.04.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2014 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
31.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.03.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2014 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2014 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2014 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
31.01.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
22 |
|
31.01.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
31.01.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
31.01.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
56 |
|
31.01.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.01.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
31.01.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
56 |
|
02.05.2013 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2013 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2013 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2013 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.2013 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
21.02.2013 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
21.09.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2002 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2001 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2001 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2001 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
16.05.2001 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.05.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
16.05.2001 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2001 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.05.2001 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |