|
23.01.2018 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.12.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.12.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.08.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.07.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2017 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2016 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.03.2013 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.03.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
30 |
|
20.03.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
20.03.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
19.03.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
19.03.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
29 |
|
19.03.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
26 |
|
19.03.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
26 |
|
19.03.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
30.01.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.01.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.01.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.01.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.01.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2012 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.10.2012 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
22 |
|
11.07.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
11.07.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.07.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
14 |
|
14.06.2012 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.06.2012 |
Request for transfer of rights - opponent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.06.2012 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.06.2012 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.06.2012 |
Note on telephone consultation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2012 |
Request for transfer of rights - opponent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.06.2012 |
Request for transfer of rights - opponent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
23.05.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.03.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.03.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.02.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.02.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.02.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Communication concerning statement of surrender/lapse of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2009 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2009 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
26.08.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
26.08.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
26.08.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
58 |
|
26.08.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
26.08.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.08.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
24.08.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.08.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
24.08.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
58 |
|
24.08.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
24.08.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
24.08.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2008 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.06.2008 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
27.05.2008 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.11.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.07.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
05.03.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.03.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2003 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2003 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.2003 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2003 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2003 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2001 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2001 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.05.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
18.05.2001 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2001 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
18.05.2001 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |