EP1156472 - Regulating button mechanism for easily regulating escape timing, silent system cooperative therewith and keyboard musical instrument equipped therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2015 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1 Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2007/27] |
Former [2001/47] | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoue, Satoshi, Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2001/47] | Representative(s) | Geyer, Ulrich F., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/47] | Geyer, Ulrich F., Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01112256.1 | 18.05.2001 | [2001/47] | Priority number, date | JP20000148717 | 19.05.2000 Original published format: JP 2000148717 | [2001/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1156472 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1156472 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G10C3/16, G10C3/26 | [2014/31] | CPC: |
G10C3/12 (EP);
G10C3/26 (EP,KR,US);
G10C3/22 (EP,US);
G10C3/20 (EP,US);
G10C5/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/47] | G10C3/16 | Designated contracting states | [2015/15] |
Former [2001/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Regelschaltermechanismus zur einfachen Steuerung der Fluchtzeit, ein damit kooperierendes geräuschloses System und hiermit ausgestattetes Tasteninstrument | [2001/47] | English: | Regulating button mechanism for easily regulating escape timing, silent system cooperative therewith and keyboard musical instrument equipped therewith | [2001/47] | French: | Mécanisme à bouton de régulation facile de temps d'échappement, système coopérant silencieux et instrument de musique à clavier l'utilisant | [2001/47] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/32] | 11.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 31.05.2015 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0675480 (YAMAHA CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * page 13, line 30 - line 56 * * page 14, line 51 - page 15, line 36 * [I] 3-10; | [A]US5844154 (KIMBLE THOMAS E [US]) [A] 1-10* abstract * |