|
22.08.2013 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.08.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
10 |
|
02.08.2013 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2013 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2013 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.07.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2013 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2013 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2013 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
8 |
|
10.10.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2012 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.04.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.04.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Reply to appeal |
Opposition |
9 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.04.2012 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
04.04.2012 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
06.12.2011 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.12.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
30.09.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.09.2011 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.09.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.08.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.07.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.06.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.06.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.06.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.05.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.02.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.01.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.01.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.12.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2009 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2009 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.2009 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
11.04.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
11.04.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
11.04.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
11.04.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.04.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.04.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
09.04.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
09.04.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.04.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
07.04.2009 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
07.04.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2008 |
Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2008 |
Request for correction of client data |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2008 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.03.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.03.2008 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2008 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.05.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.10.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2006 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.08.2006 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2006 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.12.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2003 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2002 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2002 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2002 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2002 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2001 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2001 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
23.05.2001 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.05.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.05.2001 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2001 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2001 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |