EP1271900 - Keypad system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaelbling, Michael, Dr. Gustav-Heinemann-Ring 71 81739 München / DE | [2003/01] | Application number, filing date | 01113407.9 | 01.06.2001 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1271900 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/23, H04M1/247, H01H13/70 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
G06F3/017 (EP,US);
G06F1/1626 (EP,US);
G06F1/1656 (EP,US);
G06F1/169 (EP,US);
G06F3/0346 (EP,US);
G06F3/0362 (EP,US);
G06F3/0488 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/39] |
Former [2003/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Tastatursystem | [2003/01] | English: | Keypad system | [2003/01] | French: | Système de clavier numérique | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/33] | 03.07.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 17.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/32] | 11.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.08.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5311175 (WALDMAN HERBERT [US]) [A] 1-20* abstract *; | [A]WO9523476 (KELMAN CHARLES D [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 9, lines 12-20 *; | [X]WO9955060 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * page 3, line 33 - page 7, line 31; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO0059181 (ERICSSON INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 24, lines 10-23 * |