|
29.10.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.10.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.10.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2011 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
24 |
|
12.07.2011 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
30.05.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.05.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2011 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
19.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2011 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
14 |
|
05.04.2011 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.01.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.12.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.09.2008 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2008 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.08.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
08.08.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.07.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.06.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.06.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.04.2008 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
14.04.2008 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.04.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.04.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2008 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.04.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
15 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.02.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
19.02.2008 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2007 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.10.2007 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.10.2007 |
Fax filed during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.06.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.06.2007 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.06.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.06.2007 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.06.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
05.06.2007 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.02.2007 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.09.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.07.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2006 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2006 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2006 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Opposition |
9 |
|
02.06.2006 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2006 |
Request for change of name |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
11 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
24.03.2005 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.2005 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2005 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.02.2005 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.02.2005 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.02.2005 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2005 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.02.2005 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.12.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.10.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
09.10.2004 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2004 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2004 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2004 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2004 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2004 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2004 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2004 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.03.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.01.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.06.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.06.2003 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2003 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2002 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2002 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2002 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2002 |
Communication of transfer of rights/change of name of applicant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2002 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2002 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2002 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2001 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2001 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2001 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2001 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.2001 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2001 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2001 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2001 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2001 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2001 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2001 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2001 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2001 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2001 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2001 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.06.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
08.06.2001 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.06.2001 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
08.06.2001 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.06.2001 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.06.2001 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
15 |