EP1179936 - Demodulator for CPFSK signals using a linear approximation of the CPFSK signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2002/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hammes, Markus Bahnhofstrasse 150 47178 Duisburg / DE | 02 /
Speth, Michael Robensstrasse 63 52070 Aachen / DE | 03 /
Neubauer, André Marienstrasse 32 47807 Krefeld / DE | 04 /
Madden, Michael 936 Azure St., Apt. B12 Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | [2004/04] |
Former [2002/07] | 01 /
Hammes, Markus Bahnhofstrasse 150 47178 Duisburg / DE | ||
02 /
Speth, Michael Robensstrasse 63 52070 Aachen / DE | |||
03 /
Neubauer, André Marienstrasse 32 47807 Krefeld / DE | |||
04 /
Madden, Michael 936 Azure St., Apt. B12 Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / DE | Representative(s) | Lange, Thomas, et al Patentanwälte Lambsdorff & Lange Dingolfinger Strasse 6 81673 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/07] | Lange, Thomas, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Lambsdorff & Lange Dingolfinger Strasse 6 81673 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01116217.9 | 04.07.2001 | [2002/07] | Priority number, date | DE2000138681 | 08.08.2000 Original published format: DE 10038681 | [2002/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1179936 | Date: | 13.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1179936 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/233, H04L25/03 | [2002/07] | CPC: |
H04L25/03197 (EP,US);
H04L27/2332 (EP,US);
H04L25/03337 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/07] | Title | German: | Demodulator für CPFSK-modulierte Signale unter Verwendung einer linearen Näherung des CPFSK-Signals | [2002/07] | English: | Demodulator for CPFSK signals using a linear approximation of the CPFSK signal | [2002/07] | French: | Démodulateur pour signaux FSK à phase continue (CPFSK) utilisant une approximation linéaire du signal CPFSK | [2002/07] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/19] | 11.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.06.2004 | FI | 09.06.2004 | IE | 09.06.2004 | IT | 09.06.2004 | NL | 09.06.2004 | TR | 09.06.2004 | AT | 04.07.2004 | LU | 04.07.2004 | BE | 31.07.2004 | MC | 31.07.2004 | DK | 09.09.2004 | GR | 09.09.2004 | SE | 09.09.2004 | ES | 20.09.2004 | PT | 09.11.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | CY | 09.06.2004 | |
FI | 09.06.2004 | ||
IE | 09.06.2004 | ||
IT | 09.06.2004 | ||
NL | 09.06.2004 | ||
TR | 09.06.2004 | ||
AT | 04.07.2004 | ||
LU | 04.07.2004 | ||
BE | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
Former [2007/09] | CY | 09.06.2004 | |
FI | 09.06.2004 | ||
IE | 09.06.2004 | ||
NL | 09.06.2004 | ||
TR | 09.06.2004 | ||
AT | 04.07.2004 | ||
LU | 04.07.2004 | ||
BE | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
IE | 09.06.2004 | ||
NL | 09.06.2004 | ||
TR | 09.06.2004 | ||
AT | 04.07.2004 | ||
BE | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
IE | 09.06.2004 | ||
NL | 09.06.2004 | ||
AT | 04.07.2004 | ||
BE | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
IE | 09.06.2004 | ||
BE | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
IE | 09.06.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
IE | 09.06.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
IE | 09.06.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 09.09.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4603393 (LAURENT PIERRE [FR], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 34 * * column 5, line 51 - column 7, line 30 * * figures 5,6 *; | [A] - COLAVOLPE G ET AL, "Noncoherent sequence detection of CPM", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, IEE STEVENAGE, GB, (19980205), vol. 34, no. 3, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 259 - 261, XP006009272 [A] 1-13 * page 259, column L, line 16 - page 260, column L, line 17 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19980225 | [A] - BAIER A, "DEROTATION TECHNIQUES IN RECEIVERS FOR MSK-TYPE CPM SIGNALS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE EUROPEAN SIGNAL PROCESSING CONFERENCE, AMSTERDAM, ELSEVIER, NL, (19900918), vol. 3 CONF. 5, pages 1799 - 1802, XP000365914 [A] 1-13 * page 1799, column R, line 17 - page 1801, column L, line 8 * * page 1802, column L, line 1 - column R, line 16 * * figures 2,6 * |