EP1180458 - Anti-theft system for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/08] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamanaka, Tadamasa, Pioneer Corporation Kawagoe W. 25-1, Aza Nishi-machi, Ohaza Yamada Kawagoe-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Odashima, Masahiro, Pioneer Corporation Kawagoe W. 25-1, Aza Nishi-machi, Ohaza Yamada Kawagoe-shi, Saitama / JP | 03 /
Sakuma, Koji, Pioneer Corporation Kawagoe Works 25-1, Aza Nishi-machi, Ohaza Yamada Kawagoe-shi, Saitama / JP | [2002/08] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Goddar, Heinz J. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/08] | Goddar, Heinz J. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01119243.2 | 09.08.2001 | [2002/08] | Priority number, date | JP20000246254 | 15.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000246254 | [2002/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1180458 | Date: | 20.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1180458 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/04, B60R25/10 | [2002/08] | CPC: |
B60R25/1025 (EP,US);
B60R2325/205 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/06] |
Former [2002/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeugdiebstahlsicherung | [2002/08] | English: | Anti-theft system for vehicles | [2002/08] | French: | Système antivol pour véhicules | [2002/08] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 04.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/34] | 04.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5926086 (ESCARENO JOE [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 3, line 46 - column 5, line 41 *; | [X]DE29919641U (BRECHT THOMAS [DE]) [X] 1,6 * page 2, paragraph L - page 3, line 14 *; | [A]DE9406605U (VHB FUNKTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,5,6 * page 5, line 1 - page 9, line L *; | [A]DE19508369 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * column 4, line 38 - line 47 * * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 55 * |