EP1186898 - Procedure and apparatus for testing printed circuit boards [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states atg test systems GmbH & Co. KG Reicholzheim, Zum Schlag 3 97877 Wertheim / DE | [2005/52] |
Former [2002/11] | For all designated states atg test systems GmbH & Co. KG Reicholzheim, Zum Schlag 3 97877 Wertheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lutz, Günter Wasenwiese 8 97892 Kreuzwertheim / DE | [2002/11] | Representative(s) | Ganahl, Bernhard, et al Huber & Schüssler Patentanwälte Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | Ganahl, Bernhard, et al Huber & Schüssler Patentanwälte Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/11] | Ganahl, Bernhard, et al Reinhardt Söllner Ganahl, Hausen 5b 85551 Kirchheim b. München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01119256.4 | 09.08.2001 | [2002/11] | Priority number, date | DE2000143726 | 05.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10043726 | [2002/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1186898 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1186898 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1186898 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/28, G01R1/073, G01N21/41, G01N21/88, G01B11/06, G06K9/64 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
G01R31/2806 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/11] | G01R31/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Prüfen von Leiterplatten | [2002/11] | English: | Procedure and apparatus for testing printed circuit boards | [2002/11] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour tester des circuits imprimés | [2002/11] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 25.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.12.2005 | IE | 28.12.2005 | NL | 28.12.2005 | TR | 28.12.2005 | DK | 28.03.2006 | GR | 28.03.2006 | SE | 28.03.2006 | ES | 08.04.2006 | PT | 29.05.2006 | LU | 09.08.2006 | BE | 31.08.2006 | CH | 31.08.2006 | LI | 31.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | IE | 28.12.2005 | |
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
TR | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
LU | 09.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | IE | 28.12.2005 | |
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | IE | 28.12.2005 | |
IT | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/30] | IE | 28.12.2005 | |
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | IE | 28.12.2005 | |
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | IE | 28.12.2005 | |
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | IE | 28.12.2005 | |
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | IE | 28.12.2005 | |
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | IE | 28.12.2005 | |
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | IE | 28.12.2005 | |
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | GR | 28.03.2006 | |
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | SE | 28.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2012446 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 10, paragraph 3; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US4240750 (HURD WILLIAM A [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * column A * * column 1, line 20 - line 21 * * column 2, line 11 - column 6, line 40; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE3212190 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 7, line 10 - page 9, line 4; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4427496 (KATZ GEORGE [US]) [A] 1-11 * column A * * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 47; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US4570180 (BAIER HEINZ [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * column A * * column 3, line 25 - column 10, line 65; figures 1-9B *; | [A]US4650333 (CRABB ROBERT M [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * column A * * column 4, line 10 - column 10, line 60; figures 1-10 *; | [A]US4721908 (DRILLER HUBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * column A ** column 2, line 59 - column 6, line 44; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US4758782 (KOBAYASHI KOUJI [JP]) [A] 1-11 * column A * * column 2, line 63 - column 6, line 7; figures 1-5 *; | [AD]EP0468153 (ATG ELECTRONIC GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-11 * abstract * * column 6, line 34 - column 11, line 26; figures 1-5 *; | [AD]WO9315474 (ORBOT SYSTEMS LTD [IL], et al) [AD] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]US5299268 (AMIR ISRAEL [US]) [A] 1-11 * column A * * column 3, line 19 - column 6, line 10; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5333052 (FINAROV MOSHE [IL]) [A] 1-11 * column A * * column 2, line 14 - column 3, line 58 * |