EP1293459 - Device for aligning and transporting packets of loose stacked printed products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Segbert GmbH & Co. KG Daimlerstrasse 27 48683 Ahaus / DE | [2004/20] |
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states Segbert GmbH & Co. KG Daimlerstrasse 27 48883 Ahaus / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Segbert, Stephan Bahnhofstr. 47 48619 Heek / DE | [2003/12] | Representative(s) | Rohmann, Michael, et al Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | Rohmann, Michael, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien Theaterplatz 3 45127 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01121960.7 | 12.09.2001 | [2003/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1293459 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1293459 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65H31/30, B65H29/46, B65G47/82 | [2003/12] | CPC: |
B65H31/3081 (EP);
B65G47/82 (EP);
B65H29/46 (EP);
B65H2301/42264 (EP);
B65H2301/42266 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/12] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Ausrichten und Abtransportieren von Paketen lose gestapelter Druckerzeugnisse | [2003/12] | English: | Device for aligning and transporting packets of loose stacked printed products | [2003/12] | French: | Dispositif pour aligner et transporter des paquets de produits d'imprimerie mobiles empilés | [2003/12] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 28.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 20.10.2004 | TR | 20.10.2004 | GR | 20.01.2005 | PT | 20.03.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2006/51] | IE | 20.10.2004 | |
TR | 20.10.2004 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | IE | 20.10.2004 | |
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | GR | 20.01.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4518300 (KENT DAVID P [US]) [X] 1-3,7-9 * column 3, line 26 - line 36 * * column 4, line 43 - line 48 * * figure 2 *; | [A]EP0373331 (PEMCO [US]) [A] * column 6, line 41 - column 7, line 35 ** figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0741100 (CIVIEMME SRL [IT]) [A] 3-6 * column 2, line 24 - line 30 * * figures 1,8 *; | [X]EP0745547 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,7-9 * column 4, line 3 - line 24 * * figure 2 *; | [X]US6106219 (NEWSOME JOHN ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7-10 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 8 * * figures 1,2,6A-9 * |