EP1193610 - Data processing apparatus and DMA data transfer method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/46] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | ||
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagone 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moteki, Kiyotaka 18-3, Wakabacho 1-chome Tachikawa-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Michiie, Norio 6-5-10, Nishigotanda Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Hattori, Yasuhiro 1-2-5C-101, Ekoda, Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Shimizu, Hiromitsu 4-22-10-402, Kamiikedai Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Okamura, Takao 4-22-10, Kamiikedai Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2006/37] |
Former [2002/14] | 01 /
Moteki, Kiyotaka 18-3, Wakabacho 1-chome Tachikawa-shi, Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Michie, Norio 6-5-10, Nishigotanda Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Hattori, Yasuhiro 1-2-5C-101, Ekoda, Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | |||
04 /
Shimizu, Hiromitsu 4-22-10-402, Kamiikedai Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
05 /
Okamura, Takao 4-22-10, Kamiikedai Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01122631.3 | 27.09.2001 | [2002/14] | Priority number, date | JP20000300622 | 29.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000300622 | JP20000332035 | 31.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000332035 | JP20000332744 | 31.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000332744 | [2002/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1193610 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1193610 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/28 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
G06F13/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/01] |
Former [2002/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Datenverarbeitungsvorrichtung und DMA-Datenübertragungsverfahren | [2002/14] | English: | Data processing apparatus and DMA data transfer method | [2002/14] | French: | Dispositif de traitement de données et méthode de transfert de données DMA | [2002/14] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 04.10.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 26.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.05.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.05.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH06103225 ; | [A]WO0031649 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-17 * page 1, line 33 - page 2, line 10 * * page 6, line 24 - page 7, line 12 * * figures 4,5 *; | [XA]US6092116 (EARNEST TIM [US], et al) [X] 1,5,10 * column 2, line 4 - line 9; figures 16-18 * * column 3, line 38 - line 43 * * column 11, line 46 - column 12, line 35 * * column 12, line 53 - column 13, line 27 * * claims 1-6 * [A] 2-4,6-9,11-17 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940715), vol. 018, no. 379, Database accession no. (P - 1771), & JP06103225 A 19940415 (FUJITSU LTD;OTHERS: 01) [AD] 1-17 * abstract * |