|
14.05.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
13 |
|
29.03.2010 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2010 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.03.2010 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.02.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2010 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2010 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.02.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
29.01.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
16.12.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2009 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.11.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2009 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
10 |
|
21.08.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
14.04.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
12.12.2007 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2007 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
32 |
|
19.11.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2007 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.10.2007 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.10.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.09.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.08.2007 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2007 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
31.08.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2006 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
21.02.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.12.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2005 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
30.11.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2005 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.09.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.11.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.10.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.07.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.05.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.05.2004 |
Preparation of grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
28.04.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.04.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.11.2003 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.11.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
23.09.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2002 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2002 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2001 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2001 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2001 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2001 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2001 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.09.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
28.09.2001 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.09.2001 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
01.12.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
01.12.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |