EP1202489 - Classified on-line chat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2005 [2005/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amacis Limited Falcon Road Belfast Northern Ireland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states Amacis Limited Falcon Road Belfast, Northern Ireland / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McErlean, Patrick 14 Ballymacpeake Road Portglenone, County Antrim / GB | [2002/18] | Representative(s) | O'Connell, Maura, et al FRKelly 4 Mount Charles Belfast, Northern Ireland BT7 1NZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | O'Connell, Maura, Dr., et al F. R. Kelly & Co., 9, University Street Belfast, BT7 1FY, Northern Ireland / GB | Application number, filing date | 01124430.8 | 11.10.2001 | [2002/18] | Priority number, date | GB20000025911 | 23.10.2000 Original published format: GB 0025911 | [2002/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1202489 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1202489 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/18 | [2002/18] | CPC: |
H04L12/1822 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/06] |
Former [2002/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Sortiertes Online-Kommunikationsforum | [2002/18] | English: | Classified on-line chat | [2002/18] | French: | Forum de communication en ligne classé | [2002/18] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/33] | 17.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.12.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.12.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5958014 (CAVE ELLIS K [US]) [X] 1-21 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 7 * * column 2, line 21 - line 25 * * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 10 * * column 3, line 26 - line 34 * * column 3, line 46 - line 51 *; | [A]US6125178 (WALKER JAY S [US], et al) [A] 1-21* column 6, line 5 - line 26 *; | [PX]WO0076231 (ELISA COMM OYJ [FI], et al) [PX] 1-21 * page 2, line 6 - line 12 * * page 3, line 1 - line 14 * * page 3, line 18 - line 27 * * page 4, line 1 - line 10 * |