EP1302879 - A method and system for delivering a message [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Readsoft AB S. Kyrogatan 4 25223 Helsingborg / SE | [2003/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Appelstal, Lars Batvagen 15 191 33 Sollentuna / SE | [2003/16] | Representative(s) | Rosenquist, Per Olof, et al Bergenstråhle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | Rosenquist, Per Olof, et al Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB, P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 01124499.3 | 12.10.2001 | [2003/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1302879 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
G06Q10/107 (EP,US);
H04L51/214 (EP,US);
H04L51/066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zum Liefern von einer Nachricht | [2003/16] | English: | A method and system for delivering a message | [2003/16] | French: | Procédé et système pour envoyer un message | [2003/16] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2001 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 21.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.08.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/21] | 14.03.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/21] | Appeal following examination | 06.09.2004 | Appeal received No. T1338/04 | 03.11.2004 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.03.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | Divisional application(s) | EP04015749.7 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 06.08.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5859967 (KAUFELD JAMES C [US], et al) [A] 1-25* column A; figure 1 *; | [X]WO9927467 (FROESSL HORST [DE]) [X] 1-25 * abstract * * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 9 * * page 10, line 27 - line 31 * * page 11, line 1 - line 10 * * page 13, line 13 - line 15 *; | [A]US6023700 (OWENS STEPHEN J H [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * abstract * * column 2, line 1 - line 39 *; | [X]US6119137 (SMITH JEFFREY C [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * abstract * * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 10 * * column 4, line 54 - column 6, line 12 * * column 6, line 61 - column 7, line 41 * |