EP1304058 - Mascara brush [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.08.2007 [2007/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CROWN Packaging Technology, Inc. 11535 South Central Avenue Alsip, IL 60803-2599 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states CROWN Packaging Technology, Inc 11535 South Central Avenue Alsip, IL 60803-2599 / US | ||
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states Crown Cork & Seal Technologies Corporation 11535 South Central Avenue Alsip, IL 60803-2599 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Menghini, Fabrizio Antonio 18 rue Collange 92300 Levallois-Perret / FR | 02 /
Edmondson, Mark La Sensive 72260 Courgain / FR | [2003/17] | Representative(s) | Smith, Debra Jane Clare Carnaudmetalbox PLC, Downsview Road Wantage Oxfordshire OX12 9BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | Smith, Debra Jane Clare Carnaudmetalbox PLC, Downsview Road Wantage, Oxfordshire OX12 9BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 01124743.4 | 17.10.2001 | [2003/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1304058 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A46B9/02 | [2003/17] | CPC: |
A46B9/021 (EP);
A46B2200/1053 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/17] | Title | German: | Mascara-Bürstchen | [2003/17] | English: | Mascara brush | [2003/17] | French: | Brosse à mascara | [2003/17] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/17] | 09.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/33] | 26.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5934292 (GUERET JEAN-LOUIS H [FR]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US5816728 (NARDOLILLO IRENE C [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]WO9517837 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US6237609 (VASAS MARTIN M [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0239270 | EP0832580 |