EP1205536 - Use of surfactant mixtures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2002/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Behler, Ansgar, Dr. Siegfriedstrasse 80 46240 Bottrop / DE | 02 /
Schmid, Karl Heinz, Dr. Stifterstrasse 10 40822 Mettmann / DE | 03 /
Köster, Rita Aachener Strasse 55 40223 Düsseldorf / DE | [2002/20] | Application number, filing date | 01125841.5 | 30.10.2001 | [2002/20] | Priority number, date | DE2000155303 | 08.11.2000 Original published format: DE 10055303 | [2002/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1205536 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1205536 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/83, C11D1/66, C11D1/04 | [2002/20] | CPC: |
C11D3/0094 (EP,US);
C11D1/83 (EP,US);
C11D1/04 (EP,US);
C11D1/662 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/10] |
Former [2002/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verwendung von Tensidgemischen | [2002/20] | English: | Use of surfactant mixtures | [2002/20] | French: | Utilisation des mélanges tensioactifs | [2002/20] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/20] | 01.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/45] | 07.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0209910 (ROL SPA [IT]) [A] 1-10 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 9, paragraph L *; | [A]US4863628 (NAMBUDIRY MAYARA E [IN]) [A] 1-10* example - *; | [X]EP0371339 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,9,10 * pages 9-10; examples 4D,4E * * page 1, lines 28,29 * * page 3, lines 8-17; examples 4D,4E *; | [X]DE4302314 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-3,9,10 * page 11; example 7.2 *; | [A]US5605683 (DESAI SURESHCHANDRA G [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * example -; claim 1 *; | [X]WO9924535 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,9,10 * page 14; examples 1,2 * * page 14, paragraphs 1,2 *; | [PX]WO0121149 (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE], et al) [PX] 1-10 * page 17; table 1 * * examples 7-25 * |