|
29.11.2010 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.09.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.09.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.09.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.08.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
11 |
|
13.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.06.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.06.2010 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.06.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.06.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2010 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2010 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.06.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.06.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.05.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.05.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.05.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.05.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.05.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.02.2010 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
10 |
|
17.02.2010 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.03.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.03.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.03.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
03.03.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
02.03.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
12.11.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.11.2008 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.10.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.10.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
28.10.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
03.09.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.08.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.08.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2008 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.06.2008 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2008 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.06.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.06.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2008 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.04.2008 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.04.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.02.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2007 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2007 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.07.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.06.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.09.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2006 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.04.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2006 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2006 |
Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
02.12.2005 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2005 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.10.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.10.2005 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
26.10.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.10.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.2005 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
14.09.2005 |
Intervention of the assumed infringer |
Opposition |
30 |
|
14.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
14.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
14.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
14.09.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
14.09.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
14.09.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.09.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
15.06.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.04.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
24.06.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2004 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.05.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2004 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.04.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
09.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2004 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.11.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.11.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2003 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.05.2003 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2002 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2002 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2002 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2002 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2002 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2002 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2001 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2001 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2001 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.11.2001 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2001 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.11.2001 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2001 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.11.2001 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
17.06.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
17.06.1999 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |