EP1216878 - Passenger seat for public transportation vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vogel Industrie GmbH Kleinsteinbacher Strasse 44 76228 Karlsruhe / DE | [2002/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ehemann, Ernst K. Dipl.-Ing. Rittnerstrasse 9 76227 Karlsruhe / DE | [2002/26] | Representative(s) | Dimmerling, Heinz Guntherstrasse 3 76185 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | Dimmerling, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Postfach 21 13 75 76163 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 01127180.6 | 16.11.2001 | [2002/26] | Priority number, date | DE2000164574 | 22.12.2000 Original published format: DE 10064574 | [2002/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1216878 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/24, B60N2/12, B61D33/00 | [2002/26] | CPC: |
B60N2/242 (EP);
B60N2/06 (EP);
B60N2/2209 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, ES, FR, LU, NL [2003/12] |
Former [2002/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Fahrgastsitz für Personenbeförderungsfahrzeuge | [2002/26] | English: | Passenger seat for public transportation vehicle | [2002/26] | French: | Siège de passager pour véhicule de transport en commun | [2002/26] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/33] | 01.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/49] | 07.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11180195 ; | [X]US3880462 (MEDNICK PHILIP) [X] 1,6,7 * column A * * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 5 * * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 13; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]DE2812322 (GEN MOTORS CORP) [AD] 1-7 * figures 1-3; claims 1-3 *; | [A]DD133079 (WALTER MARGITTA, et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [AD]DE3151259 (STABILUS GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991029), vol. 1999, no. 12, & JP11180195 A 19990706 (TOKYU CAR CORP) [A] 1-7 * abstract * |