EP1213736 - Relay apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | ||
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudoudou-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokouji-doori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu, 600-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ide, Takahiro c/o Omron Corp. 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 02 /
Nagashima, Yoshimasa c/o Omron Corp Horikawahigashi 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2002/24] | Representative(s) | Kilian, Helmut Wilhelms, Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | Kilian, Helmut, Dr. Wilhelms, Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01127758.9 | 21.11.2001 | [2002/24] | Priority number, date | JP20000370587 | 05.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000370587 | [2002/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1213736 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1213736 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01H47/00 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
H01H47/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/24] | Title | German: | Relaieinrichtung | [2002/24] | English: | Relay apparatus | [2002/24] | French: | Dispositif de relais | [2002/24] | Examination procedure | 14.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 06.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.06.2006 | BE | 07.06.2006 | CH | 07.06.2006 | CY | 07.06.2006 | FI | 07.06.2006 | LI | 07.06.2006 | NL | 07.06.2006 | TR | 07.06.2006 | DK | 07.09.2006 | SE | 07.09.2006 | GR | 08.09.2006 | ES | 18.09.2006 | PT | 07.11.2006 | IE | 21.11.2006 | LU | 21.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
TR | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
IE | 21.11.2006 | ||
LU | 21.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
IE | 21.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
IE | 21.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
IE | 21.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 07.06.2006 | |
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 07.09.2006 | |
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 07.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19750958 (ELAN SCHALTELEMENTE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,8 * column 6, line 43 - column 7, line 59; figure . *; | [A]DE19736183 (SCHLEICHER RELAIS [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]DE19751674 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,8 * column 3, line 4 - line 41; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE19913933 (DOLD & SOEHNE KG E [DE]) [Y] 2,4,6,7 * column 7, line 22 - line 68; figure 3 *; | [XY]US5999395 (KLEES CHRISTOPH [DE]) [X] 1,8 * column 4, line 56 - column 7, line 15; figure 3 * [Y] 2,4,6,7 |