|
18.09.2014 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2014 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2014 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2014 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.09.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.09.2014 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.07.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2014 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.07.2014 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.07.2014 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.07.2014 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.07.2014 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.07.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2014 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.04.2014 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.03.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.02.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2013 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Opposition |
18 |
|
13.02.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Opposition |
22 |
|
09.10.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.10.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.10.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.08.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.2012 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
19.01.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
04.01.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
10.12.2010 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.12.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2010 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.10.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2010 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.10.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2010 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.05.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.05.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
25.05.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
25.05.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
25.05.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
25.05.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
26.03.2010 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.03.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2010 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.03.2010 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.01.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
15.01.2010 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2010 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2010 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.10.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.09.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2009 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.06.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2009 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.05.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2009 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.12.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
23.11.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
16.10.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.10.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.10.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.07.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
35 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
49 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
02.05.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
02.05.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.05.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2006 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2005 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.05.2005 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2005 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.05.2005 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.05.2005 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2005 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
14.02.2005 |
Invitation to file a translation of the previous application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
17.01.2005 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2005 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.04.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.12.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.09.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
20.05.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.05.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.02.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2002 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.10.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2002 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2002 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2002 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2002 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2002 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2002 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2001 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2001 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2001 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2001 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.07.2001 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.07.2001 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.06.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2001 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.05.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.05.2001 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2001 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.05.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
04.05.2001 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |