EP1158183 - Wet flue gas desulfurisation scrubber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/48] | Arrangement for equalisation of the velocity distribution in a fluid stream, especially a gas stream, in a conduit | ||
[2004/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E.ON Wasserkraft GmbH Postfach 20 10 65 45845 Gelsenkirchen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | For all designated states E.ON Kraftwerke GmbH Postfach 20 10 65 45845 Gelsenkirchen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gauert, Jörg Am Scherenbach 14 46514 Schermbeck / DE | [2001/48] | Representative(s) | Meyer, Hans-Joachim Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | Meyer, Hans-Joachim Cohausz & Florack, Patentanwälte, Kanzlerstrasse 8a 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 01250180.5 | 22.05.2001 | [2001/48] | Priority number, date | DE2000125061 | 23.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10025061 | [2001/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1158183 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1158183 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | [2002/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1158183 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F15D1/02, G01M9/04 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
F15D1/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/48] | F15D1/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/48] | Title | German: | Waschturm für Rauchgasentschwefelungsanlagen | [2005/14] | English: | Wet flue gas desulfurisation scrubber | [2004/41] | French: | Tour de lavage pour la désulfurisation de gaz de fumée | [2004/41] |
Former [2001/48] | Anordnung zur Vergleichmässigung der Geschwindigkeitsverteilung eines Fluidstroms, insbesondere eines Gasstroms, in einem Strömungskanal | ||
Former [2001/48] | Arrangement for equalisation of the velocity distribution in a fluid stream, especially a gas stream, in a conduit | ||
Former [2001/48] | Agencement pour l'égalisation de la distribution d'un flux, surtout d'un flux gazeux, dans un conduit | Examination procedure | 31.01.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 02.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.08.2005 | FI | 17.08.2005 | FR | 17.08.2005 | GB | 17.08.2005 | IE | 17.08.2005 | IT | 17.08.2005 | NL | 17.08.2005 | TR | 17.08.2005 | DK | 17.11.2005 | GR | 17.11.2005 | SE | 17.11.2005 | PT | 17.01.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2007/36] | FI | 17.08.2005 | |
GB | 17.08.2005 | ||
IE | 17.08.2005 | ||
IT | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
TR | 17.08.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 17.08.2005 | |
GB | 17.08.2005 | ||
IE | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
TR | 17.08.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | FI | 17.08.2005 | |
GB | 17.08.2005 | ||
IE | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | FI | 17.08.2005 | |
IE | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 17.08.2005 | |
IE | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 17.08.2005 | |
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 17.08.2005 | |
SE | 17.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3842678 (DE BAUN K, et al) [X] 1,2,4-6 * column 5, lines 1-40; figures 6,7; claims 1-3 *; | [X]US3964519 (DE BAUN KENNETH W) [X] 1,2,4-6 * column 2, lines 22-42; figure -; claims 2,3 *; | [X]US3996025 (GULDEN PETER) [X] 1,3-6* column 3, lines 47-61; figure -; claims 1,2 * | Examination | US5648022 |