EP1355549 - METHOD FOR FITTING A SHOE TO A FOOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/44] | A METHOD FOR MEASURING A SHAPE OF A FOOT | ||
[2004/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bonus Ortho System a Islandi HF Namuvegi 2 625 Olafsfiroi / IS | [2003/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GISLASON, Kolbeinn Hladbrekku 3 IS-200 Kopavogur / IS | [2003/44] | Representative(s) | Hardarson, Gunnar Örn Arnason Faktor Intellectual Property Consulting Gudridarstig 2-4 113 Reykjavik / IS | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Hardarson, Gunnar Örn A&P Arnason ehf. Intellectual Property Group Efstaleiti 5 103 Reykjavik / IS | ||
Former [2003/44] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsgade 9 P.O. Box 831 2100 Copenhagen O / DK | Application number, filing date | 01271161.0 | 19.12.2001 | [2003/44] | WO2001IS00023 | Priority number, date | IS20000578500 | 21.12.2000 Original published format: IS 578500 | [2003/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0249473 | Date: | 27.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1355549 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1355549 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A43D1/02, A43D3/02, A43D3/08 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
A43D3/027 (EP,US);
A43D1/02 (EP,US);
A43D3/021 (EP,US);
A43D3/1441 (EP,US);
A43D3/1466 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ANPASSEN EINES SCHUHES AN EINEN FUSS | [2004/33] | English: | METHOD FOR FITTING A SHOE TO A FOOT | [2004/33] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'ADAPTER UNE CHAUSSURE A UN PIED | [2004/33] |
Former [2003/44] | METHODE ZUR MESSUNG DER FORM EINES FUSSES | ||
Former [2003/44] | A METHOD FOR MEASURING A SHAPE OF A FOOT | ||
Former [2003/44] | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE MESURER LA FORME D'UN PIED | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 08.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.03.2005 | CH | 23.03.2005 | LI | 23.03.2005 | TR | 23.03.2005 | GR | 23.06.2005 | CY | 19.12.2005 | IE | 19.12.2005 | [2007/20] |
Former [2006/51] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
TR | 23.03.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
IE | 19.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
IE | 19.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
CH | 23.03.2005 | ||
LI | 23.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 23.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB189288 (FRANK GORDON HORNE) [X] 1-2,7-10 [Y] 4-6; | [XY]US1587496 (EMILIO ALTIERI) [X] 1-2,7-10 [Y] 4-6; | [A]US1777747 (DE WITT WILLIAM J) [A] 1-3; | [XY]EP0044611 (COOPER FOOTLINE P R [GB]) [X] 1-3,7-10,12 [Y] 4-6,11; | [Y]US5746952 (MARSHALL SCOTT [US]) [Y] 4-6; | [Y]US5879725 (POTTER DANIEL R [US]) [Y] 11; | [A]DE19922151 (TECMATH GMBH & CO KG [DE])[A] 1 |