EP1345980 - METHOD FOR CONTINUOS PRODUCTION OF POLYESTERS OR COPOLYESTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zimmer AG Borsigallee 1 60388 Frankfurt / DE | [2003/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REISEN, Michael Merianplatz 1 60316 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
WILHELM, Fritz Rendeler Strasse 79a 61184 Karben / DE | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann Dr. Meyer- Dulheuer & Partners LLP Franklinstrasse 61-63 60486 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/21] | Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann, Dr. Patentanwalt, Metzlerstrasse 27 60594 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 01271410.1 | 27.11.2001 | [2003/39] | WO2001EP13776 | Priority number, date | DE2000164361 | 21.12.2000 Original published format: DE 10064361 | DE2001127147 | 02.06.2001 Original published format: DE 10127147 | [2003/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0250159 | Date: | 27.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1345980 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1345980 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/78, C07C67/02, C07C67/03, B01D3/00 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
B01D3/14 (EP,US);
C08G63/78 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN HERSTELLUNG VON POLYESTERN ODER COPOLYESTERN | [2003/39] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTINUOS PRODUCTION OF POLYESTERS OR COPOLYESTERS | [2003/39] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION EN CONTINU DE POLYESTERS OU DE COPOLYESTERS | [2003/39] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 17.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 25.05.2005 | NL | 25.05.2005 | DK | 25.08.2005 | GR | 25.08.2005 | SE | 25.08.2005 | PT | 27.10.2005 | AT | 27.11.2005 | CY | 27.11.2005 | BE | 30.11.2005 | CH | 30.11.2005 | LI | 30.11.2005 | LU | 30.11.2005 | MC | 30.11.2005 | [2007/23] |
Former [2007/20] | FI | 25.05.2005 | |
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
CY | 27.11.2005 | ||
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/13] | FI | 25.05.2005 | |
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 25.05.2005 | |
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/42] | FI | 25.05.2005 | |
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | FI | 25.05.2005 | |
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | FI | 25.05.2005 | |
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 25.05.2005 | |
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 25.05.2005 | |
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 25.05.2005 | |
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 25.08.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH09124783 ; | [AD]US4670580 (MAURER CHARLES J [US]) [AD] 1-12 * claim 1 * * column 3, paragraphs 2,3 * * column 5, paragraph 2 * * column 6, paragraph 3 * * examples 1-4 *; | [A]US5466776 (KRAUTSTRUNK JUERGEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * claim 1 ** column 2, line 48 - line 65 *; | [A]EP1046662 (LURGI ZIMMER AKTIENGESELLSCHAF [DE]) [A] 1-12 * claims 1,5,6 * * page 4, paragraph 2 * * examples 4-8 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 29, Database accession no. 1997-316631, XP002195467 & JPH09124783 A 19970513 (TORAY IND INC) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |